judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LELA M. MASSIE, ET AL. v. H. A. COPELAND, ET UX.

Case: A-2663
A-2663
04/20/1950
Application for Writ of Error
LELA M. MASSIE, ET AL.
H. A. COPELAND, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/20/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/13/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1956Miscellaneous letter
10/18/1950Dissenting opinion issued.
10/18/1950Opinion issued
06/20/1950Supplemental Brief filed
06/13/1950Supplemental Brief filed
05/24/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/20/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. A. Copeland, et ux.Respondent
Lela M. Massie, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information