judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3792
B-3792
01/22/1973
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, INC. AND AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, TEXAS DIVISION
MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/19/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/05/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1973Response to Motion filed
04/19/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/05/1973Response to Petition
01/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mercantile National Bank at Dallas, et al.Respondent
American Cancer Society, Inc. and American Cancer Society, Texas DivisionPetitioner
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information