judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3802
B-3802
01/24/1973
Application for Writ of Error
L.M.B. CORPORATION
LOUIS GURECKY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/18/1973Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/31/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
07/27/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
07/12/1973Errata FiledPetitioner
02/19/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/24/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/1973Response to Motion filed
11/14/1973Letter Filed
11/14/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/31/1973Dissenting opinion issued.
10/31/1973Opinion issued
09/18/1973Response to Brief filed
08/31/1973Post submission brief filed
07/27/1973Post submission brief filed
07/12/1973Errata Filed
06/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1973Response to Petition
01/24/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/24/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L.M.B. CorporationPetitioner
Louis GureckyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information