judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT RULES (WDCR)

Administrative Case: ADKT 0238
Short Caption:IN RE: SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT RULES (WDCR)Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:05/16/1996Public Hearing:
Closed Date:11/12/1996

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/16/1996Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 96-00032
09/24/1996Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/08/1996Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rules of Practice for the Second Judicial District Court. Effective January 1, 1998. 96-00033
11/12/1996Administrative CaseCase Closed.