judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SASSER (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 60091
Short Caption:SASSER (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257941Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2014How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/24/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/24/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) 12-02516
01/25/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 12-02692
02/01/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cheryl Carpenter stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/20/11; 7/18/11; 9/12/11; 11/21/11; 11/30/11; and 12/7/11. 12-03546
02/24/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: September 29, 2009 and September 30, 2009. 12-06055
02/28/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: March 23, 2010; March 25, 2010; March 30, 2010, April 6, 2010; July 15, 2010; August 19, 2010; October 14, 2010; January 25, 2011; January 27, 2011; January 28, 2011; January 31, 2011; March 1, 2011; March 22, 2011 and June 14, 2011. 12-06356
02/29/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement. 12-06561
03/02/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days. 12-06803
05/03/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement. 12-13978
05/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. 12-15149
05/30/2012MotionFiled Motion to Transmit a Copy of the Presentence Investigation Report. 12-16993
06/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. District court: 20 days from the date of this order to forward, in a sealed envelope, a certified copy of the presentence investigation report. 12-17247
06/12/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement. 12-18439
06/15/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. 12-18806
07/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
07/18/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement. 12-22736
07/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days. 12-23826
07/31/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 12-24141
07/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 12-24143
08/20/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 12-26063
09/11/2012Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed.
10/09/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. Appellant shall have 30 days to file and serve the opening brief. 12-31903
11/15/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. 12-36268
11/15/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Opening Brief due: December 26, 2012. 12-36270
12/27/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. 12-41007
01/02/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due: January 15, 2013. 13-00042
01/17/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File the Opening Brief. 13-01983
01/25/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 7 days 13-02730
02/06/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. 13-03908
02/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. 13-05690
02/26/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief. 13-05959
03/27/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 13-09089
05/01/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File State's Response to Appellant's Opening Brief. 13-12790
05/01/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: May 27, 2013. 13-12792
05/30/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Time Reply to State's Response to Appellant's Opening Brief. 13-16020
06/05/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply brief due: June 7, 2013. 13-16410
06/12/2013BriefFiled Reply Brief. 13-17214
06/12/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. 14-04109
02/07/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/29/2014Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Gibbons, C.J. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 41. EN BANC 14-17319
06/23/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 14-20625
06/23/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/03/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 26, 2014. 14-20625
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated December 17, 2014 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 59976/60091/60622/59630/56591/(60598/61038)/61655/61681/61082/62890/59210/62768/62944/62160/63871/(58530/59162)/61820/63444/53264/60050/63078. (Letter entered in 59976 as document no. 14-41986)