judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3813
B-3813
01/22/1973
Application for Writ of Error
JEWEL MANESS, MRS. FRANCES RHEA MANESS
EVERETT REESE, WALTER JUNCKER AND DON PACE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/29/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/29/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/28/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/27/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
02/20/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/28/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1973Response to Petition
02/20/1973Response to Petition
02/05/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Frances Rhea ManessPetitioner
Jewel ManessPetitioner
Everett ReeseRespondent
Walter Juncker and Don PaceRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information