judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8726
B-8726
08/13/1979
Application for Writ of Error
NATIONAL BANK OF COMMERCE, SOUTHWEST LAND TITLE COMPANY
JAMES L. MAY AND BEULAH LEONA MAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/04/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/27/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/01/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
09/17/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/22/1979Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/15/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1980Response to Motion filed
03/05/1980Response to Motion filed
03/04/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1979Response to Petition
09/17/1979Response to Petition
08/28/1979Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
08/22/1979Response to Petition
08/15/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James L. May and Beulah Leona MayRespondent
National Bank of CommercePetitioner
Southwest Land Title CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information