judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GEORGE D. BASHAM, ET AL. v. BAYARD MARTIN SMITH, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR, ET AL.

Case: A-2650
A-2650
04/13/1950
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE D. BASHAM, ET AL.
BAYARD MARTIN SMITH, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/19/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/22/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/04/1950Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
07/27/1950Response to Motion filed
07/19/1950Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/05/1950Opinion issued
05/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1950Response to Petition
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/13/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bayard Martin Smith, Independent Executor, et al.Respondent
George D. Basham, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information