judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDI HASSAN JIMALE V. DONOHOE HOSPITALITY SERVICES, ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-1292
Short Caption:ABDI HASSAN JIMALE V. DONOHOE HOSPITALITY SERVICES, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7021-09Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/05/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/19/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdi Hassan Jimale N
Ray M. ShepardYY
AppelleeDonahoe Hospitality Services LLCN
Paul R. PearsonYN
Appellee2101 Wisconsin Associates District of ColumbiaN
Paul R. PearsonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 15, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
11/05/2010RECORD INDEX
11/05/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/20/2010APPENDIX (Joint)
01/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/25/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/25/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Oberly, Terry, King
07/28/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, and Terry and King, Senior Judges.)
08/19/2011FiledMandate