judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE APPLICATION OF AND JUSTICE FOR ALL

Case Information: 33435
Short Caption:IN RE APPLICATION OF AND JUSTICE FOR ALLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Other - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/07/1998Petition/BarFiled Petition for Certification pursuant to SCR 42.5. 98-00279
12/07/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/15/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Legal Club of America--check no. 004757.
01/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities. Within 30 days thereafter, petitioner may file responsive points and authorities and any supplemental documents. Upon receipt of the response and further documentation, the petition shall be deemed submitted for this court's final review. Petitioner is hereby ordered to submit a copy of its petition and exhibits to the State Bar. 99-00098
02/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. "MISSING DOCUMENT" 99-00850
03/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The state bar shall have until April 2, 1999, to file its report. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the report to file responsive points and authorities and any supplemental documents. Upon receipt of the response and any further documentation, the matter will be deemed submitted for this court's final review. 99-02072
04/02/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response and Recommendations. 99-02479
07/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a response addressing the concerns in the State Bar's recommendation. Failure to file a response may be viewed as an abandonment of the petition, and may result in the dismissal of the petition as abandoned. 99-06217
08/16/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to State Bar of Nevada's Response and Recommendations. Mailed on 8/13/99--FedEx. 99-07614
01/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall immediately cease and desist from placing advertisements such as those which have appeared in the Nevada Lawyer, unless and until the plan is certified. Bar counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a report evaluating petitioner's website's compliance with SCR 42.5. Within 30 days thereafter, petitioner may file responsive points and authorities. Upon receipt of petitoner's response and additional documentation, the petition shall be deemed submitted for this court's final review. 00-00424
01/26/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Petitioner's Response to Required Conditions and Additional Documentation as Required. 00-01268
02/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response and Recommendation. 00-02199
06/01/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Certification Pursuant to SCR 42.5. " . . . we grant the petition." En Banc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB 00-09216
06/01/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.