judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BONNIE A. MCCANN v. CITY OF CODY, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0134)
Case Number:S-08-0134Case Docketed On:06/25/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wyoming State Constitution
Short Title:BONNIE A. MCCANN v. CITY OF CODY, WYOMING
Full Title:BONNIE A. MCCANN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CITY OF CODY, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBonnie A. McCannJohn R. Hursh
AppelleeCity of Cody, WyomingScott E. Kolpitcke
Tracy J. Copenhaver

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2009 WY 86
Citation:210 P.3d 1078

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/25/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/06/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and received copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Internal - Veto of expedite recommendationNotice-InternalVetoFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Hursh for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Kolpitcke for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John R. Hursh for appellant; Scott E. Kolpitcke for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court. Justice Burke files a dissenting opinion, with whom Justice Kite joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/23/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/23/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/29/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/27/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal