judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8738
B-8738
08/15/1979
Application for Writ of Error
KATIE BOFYSIL MARUT, ET AL.
J. FULLER COLLIER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/10/1980Letter brief Petitioner
01/07/1980Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/31/1979Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/20/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/26/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/12/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
09/05/1979Errata FiledPetitioner
08/27/1979Appendix FiledPetitioner
08/15/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/10/1980Letter brief
01/07/1980Supplemental Brief filed
12/31/1979Brief in Support of Petition
12/20/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/26/1979Reply to Response
09/12/1979Response to Petition
09/05/1979Errata Filed
08/27/1979Appendix Filed
08/20/1979Motion for Extension of Time filed
08/15/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/15/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. Fuller Collier, et al.Respondent
Katie Bofysil Marut, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information