judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REDMEN (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 33436
Short Caption:REDMEN (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C93429Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/01/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00281
01/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-00432
01/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (mailed on: 01/25/99). 99-00567
05/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. fn2[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date of this order]. 99-04454
06/14/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: December 20, 1995, February 14, 1996, April 17, 1996 and July 12, 1996. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 99-05116
06/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-05117
06/14/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 17, 1996, July 12, 1996, December 20, 1995, February 14, 1996 and October 8, 1990. To Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 99-05118
09/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. 99-09199
10/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 27, 1999. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the schedule set forth in NRAP 31(a)(1). See SCR 250(7) (c). 99-09522
10/28/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. 99-10568
11/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. 99-11883
12/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: December 27, 1999. No futher extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-12272
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. 99-13161
12/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 10, 2000. 99-13364
01/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Allow Appellant to file an Opening Brief in excess of 30 pages. 00-00598
01/13/2000AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 00-00602
03/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the thirty-eight page opening brief and the appendix provisionally received on January 13, 2000. Respondent shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-03421
03/03/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-00601
03/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 and 2. 00-00602
03/24/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04771
03/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-04772
05/01/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/10/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. 00-07726
05/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Disapproved. On May 10, 2000, the parties filed a stipualtion to extend the time to file appellant's reply brief. Because the stipulation was not timely filed, it is disapproved. In the interest of judicial economy, we grant appellant an extension until June 6, 2000, to file the reply brief. Failure to file the reply brief on or before June 6, 2000, may result in this matter being submitted for decision on the opening biref, answering brief and appendices filed in this matter. 00-08391
06/01/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/30/00. 00-09209
06/01/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11579
07/26/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 7/24/00--LV Drop Box. 00-12944
08/30/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15309
09/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15423
09/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15423