judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POWDER RIVER BASIN GAS, CORP., a Colorado corporation v. MACDONALD MADER

Case Heading (S-08-0135)
Case Number:S-08-0135Case Docketed On:06/26/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:POWDER RIVER BASIN GAS, CORP., a Colorado corporation v. MACDONALD MADER
Full Title:POWDER RIVER BASIN GAS, CORP., a Colorado corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. MACDONALD MADER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPowder River Basin Gas, Corp., a Colorado corporationRex O. Arney
Mistee Lyn Elliott
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeMacdonald MaderHayden F. Heaphy Jr.
Sasha M. Johnston

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/26/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/05/2008Motion - Supplement the record and appendixMotionSupplement the recordFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion to supplement recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/26/2008Order - Granting motion to supplement record.OrderGrantFinal
09/11/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (stipulated)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - stipulated motion for extension of time (Untimely)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/14/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/14/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
10/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal