judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00622-CR
05-82-00622-CR
05/21/1982
Burglary of a Habitation
John Karl Sanders
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
08/30/1983Letter received
05/24/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/18/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/29/1982Letter issued by the court
07/12/1982Clerks record filed
07/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
05/21/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
05/19/1982Amended notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Sanders, John KarlCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 291st District Court
F81-12490-KU
50 Years TDC