judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00107-CR
02-82-00107-CR
05/24/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Young, Jr., Harold Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/02/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/05/1983Order EnteredRefused
05/23/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
05/04/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/25/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Phillip O. Vick
187363-R
life