judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00236-CV
04-82-00236-CV
05/24/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Safeguard Security Services, Inc.
Executive Armoring Corp., et al.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/24/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/24/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/19/1982Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/1982Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
06/22/1982Motion for Leave DisposedOtherwise Disposed
06/18/1982Motion for Leave Filed
05/24/1982Motion for Leave Filed
05/24/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/24/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
57th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
81-CI-12864
n/a