judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00052-CV
09-82-00052-CV
05/24/1982
Workers Compensation
Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co.
Gobert, John W.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1983Exhibits FiledMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1983Case stored
04/27/1983Mandate Issued
03/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1982Submission
08/10/1982Brief Filed
07/16/1982Brief Filed
06/30/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/02/1982Statement of Facts Filed
05/24/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
136th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack R. King
D111453