judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5955
A-5955
07/13/1956
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
SHELL OIL COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION
J. EARL RUDDER, COMMISSIONER OF THE GENERAL LAND OFFICE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/24/1956Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
10/24/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
10/22/1956Reply to ResponseRelator
10/02/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/14/1957Letter Filed
03/06/1957Order from Lower Court filed
03/06/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
03/06/1957Opinion issued
10/24/1956Brief in Support of Petition
10/24/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
10/22/1956Reply to Response
10/02/1956Response to Petition
07/13/1956Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. Earl Rudder, Commissioner of the General Land Office of the State of TexasRespondent
Shell Oil Company, a Delaware CorporationRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information