judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5961
A-5961
07/17/1956
Application for Writ of Error
PAN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
COOPER BUTANE COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/14/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/07/1957Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/30/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/28/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/06/1957Miscellaneous letter
04/03/1957Opinion issued
03/14/1957Response to Brief filed
03/07/1957Post submission brief filed
01/30/1957Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1956Response to Motion filed
11/30/1956Brief in Support of Petition
11/07/1956Motion for Extension of Time filed
11/07/1956Motion for Rehearing
07/28/1956Response to Petition
07/17/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/17/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pan American Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Cooper Butane Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information