judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5986
A-5986
07/13/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GULF OIL CORPORATION
BOB ALEXANDER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/13/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/12/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/15/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/13/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/12/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/12/1956Response to Motion filed
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/09/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/24/1956Opinion issued
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Collins, Garrison, Renfrom and ZeleskeyAmicus Curiae
Gulf Oil Corporation Petitioner
W. R. SmithAmicus Curiae
D. H. Culton and B. M. BritainAmicus Curiae
Ton SealyAmicus Curiae
Bob AlexanderRespondent
Atwood McDonaldAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information