judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6032
A-6032
07/11/1956
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JOSEPH M. RUMMLER, ET AL.
TOM REAVLEY, SECRETARY OF STATE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/22/1956Motion for RehearingRelator
09/12/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/25/1956Opinion issued
09/22/1956Miscellaneous letter
09/22/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/13/1956Miscellaneous letter
09/12/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/12/1956Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/11/1956Opinion issued
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joseph M. Rummler, et al.Relator
Tom Reavley, Secretary of StateRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information