judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5987
A-5987
07/31/1956
Application for Writ of Error
LESLIE EARL CARTER
TEXARKANA BUS COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/20/1956Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/09/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/08/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/20/1956Response to Motion filed
11/20/1956Brief in Support of Petition
11/09/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/31/1956Opinion issued
08/08/1956Response to Petition
07/31/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Leslie Earl CarterPetitioner
Texarkana Bus Company, IncorporatedRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information