judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5988
A-5988
08/01/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE W. CHRISTY, ET AL.
W. S> WILLIAMS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/20/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/19/1956Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/15/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/09/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
08/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1957Opinion issued
11/20/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/20/1956Response to Motion filed
11/19/1956Motion to dismiss
11/19/1956Brief on the Merits
11/15/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/09/1956Response to Petition
08/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/01/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George W. Christy, et al.Petitioner
George W. SparksAmicus Curiae
W. S> Williams, et al.Respondent
Elbert M. MorrowAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information