judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5970
A-5970
07/23/1956
Application for Writ of Error
G. R. OLIPHINT
GEORGE W. CHRISTY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/27/1957Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/27/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/28/1957Response to Motion filed
03/27/1957Brief in Support of Petition
03/27/1957Motion to Stay Filed Overruled
03/13/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
03/13/1957Opinion issued
10/31/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1956Response to Petition
07/23/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George W. Christy, et al.Respondent
G. R. OliphintPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information