judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5976
A-5976
07/30/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MORTGAGE INVESTMENT COMPANY OF EL PASO, TEXAS
J. C. MCCONNELL AND J.C. MCCONNELL LAND COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/08/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/08/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/02/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/02/1957Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/16/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/24/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/13/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/08/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/08/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/24/1957Opinion issued
03/02/1957Response to Brief filed
03/02/1957Supplemental Brief filed
02/16/1957Brief on the Merits
01/16/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/16/1957Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/13/1956Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/30/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mortgage Investment Company of El Paso, TexasPetitioner
Clinton FosheeAmicus Curiae
J. C. McConnell and J.C. McConnell Land CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information