judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5952
A-5952
07/13/1956
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLENE JONES, ET AL.
M. CARL JONES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/01/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/27/1956Supplement to ResponseRespondent
07/19/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/1956Opinion issued
11/06/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/01/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/27/1956Supplement to Response
07/19/1956Response to Petition
07/13/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/13/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard F. Loomis, Jr., Fred Frisman, Rosenfield Berwald, Wm. HurwitzAmicus Curiae
M. Carl Jones, et al.Respondent
Charlene Jones, et al.Petitioner
D. J. Silman and Mullinax WellsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information