judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

C-M-S, INCORPORATED AND W. C. HENGER v. JOE O. BLACKWELL AND DAVID H. BAKER

Case: A-2655
A-2655
04/18/1950
Application for Writ of Error
C-M-S, INCORPORATED AND W. C. HENGER
JOE O. BLACKWELL AND DAVID H. BAKER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/19/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/14/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
06/08/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/19/1950Motion for Rehearing
10/04/1950Opinion issued
06/14/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/08/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/08/1950Motion for leave to file brief
05/24/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Response to Petition
04/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert L. Clark, et al.Amicus Curiae
C-M-S, Incorporated and W. C. HengerPetitioner
Joe O. Blackwell and David H. BakerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information