judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGETOWN UNIV.HOSP. ET AL V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1287
Short Caption:GEORGETOWN UNIV.HOSP. ET AL V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Lead:10-AA-1287Consolidated: 10-AA-1297
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB147-10Filed Date:10/20/2010

Opening Event Date:10/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorKaren L. Janczy N
Benjamin T. BoscoloYY
Jason C. Zappasodi NN
PetitionerGeorgetown University HospitalN
William S. Hopkins YN
PetitionerSedgwick Cms N
William S. Hopkins NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/20/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/20/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/20/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb, Esq.
11/19/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioners' brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC) elp
12/29/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF (10-AA-1287)
12/29/2010APPENDIX
01/12/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE of Karen L. Janczy
01/20/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal filed in these matters, and it appearing that petitioners' brief has been filed in no. 10-AA-1287, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-AA-1287 and 10-AA-1297 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
01/20/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Karen L. Janczy as an intervenor in petition no. 10-AA-1287. It is (MORE)
01/20/2011 F/O that, in petition for review no. 10-AA-1297, petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(a)(1), shall be filed witin 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's consolidated brief and intervenor's brief in petition for review no. 10-AA-1287 shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW)
01/25/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - by Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS (10-AA-1297)
02/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Karen Janczy) no oppo to 3/1/11
02/15/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS as intervenors in appeal no. 10-AA-1297. It is
02/15/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the consolidated brief (opening brief in 10-AA-1297) and response brief in 10-AA-1287) shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. It is F/O that the briefs of respondent and intervenors Georgetown University Hospital and Sedgwick CMS shall be filed on or before March 31, 2011. (ETW)
03/01/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF - (Karen Janczy) (opening brief 10-AA-1297 & response brief 10-AA-1287)
03/09/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (D.C.)
03/29/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF filed by. William Hopkins (BI for both Georgetown Univ. Hospital and Sedgwick CMS per Mr. Hopkins)- dlm
03/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2011FiledMotion for Oral Argument (Petitioner Georgetown University Hospital)
09/27/2011FiledOrder Denying petitioner, Georgetown Univ. Hospital motion for oral argument.
10/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Ruiz, King
01/25/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.)
02/16/2012FiledMandate