judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTY OF CLARK VS. WENDT

Case Information: 33429
Short Caption:COUNTY OF CLARK VS. WENDTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A317275Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00268
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant: 10 days. 99-00174
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00507
02/17/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 25, 1999. 99-01070
03/01/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01365
03/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01464
03/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-01709
03/11/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.