judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAMOS VS. STATE

Case Information: 33439
Short Caption:GAMOS VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971712Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00296
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33356, 33363, 33364, 33439, 33454, 33473. 99-00314
02/10/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-00943
02/10/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09858
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10392
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10392