judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEORGE W. VROMAN POST NO. 2 of THE AMERICAN LEGION, a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation v. CASPER BASEBALL CLUB, Inc. f/k/a CASPER LEGION BASEBALL CLUB, Inc., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation, BONNIE FOSTER, HARLAN ROBINSON, BRENT JURGENSEN, JAN THOMAS, BOB WHITED, BILLIE JO GIBSON, MARK HILL, TODD CONDELARIO, ROSIE BROWN and GUS HOLBROOK

Case Heading (S-08-0138)
Case Number:S-08-0138Case Docketed On:06/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:GEORGE W. VROMAN POST NO. 2 of THE AMERICAN LEGION, a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation v. CASPER BASEBALL CLUB, Inc. f/k/a CASPER LEGION BASEBALL CLUB, Inc., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation, BONNIE FOSTER, HARLAN ROBINSON, BRENT JURGENSEN, JAN THOMAS, BOB WHITED, BILLIE JO GIBSON, MARK HILL, TODD CONDELARIO, ROSIE BROWN and GUS HOLBROOK
Full Title:GEORGE W. VROMAN POST NO. 2 of THE AMERICAN LEGION, a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CASPER BASEBALL CLUB, Inc. f/k/a CASPER LEGION BASEBALL CLUB, Inc., a Wyoming Nonprofit Corporation, BONNIE FOSTER, HARLAN ROBINSON, BRENT JURGENSEN, JAN THOMAS, BOB WHITED, BILLIE JO GIBSON, MARK HILL, TODD CONDELARIO, ROSIE BROWN and GUS HOLBROOK, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGeorge W. Vroman Post No. 2 of The American LegionFrank R. Chapman
Thomas A. Valdez
Tamara Schroeder Crolla
AppelleeCasper Baseball Club, Inc.Timothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeBonnie FosterTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeHarlan RobinsonTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeBrent JurgensenTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeJan ThomasTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeBob WhitedTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeBillie Jo GibsonTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeMark HillTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeTodd CondelarioTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeRosie BrownTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeGus HolbrookTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/27/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/13/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/30/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/01/2008Event - Hardcopy received -brief of appelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Tamara Schroeder for appellant; and Timothy Stubson for appellee Casper Baseball Club.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/13/2008Event - Phone Call. Contacted Tamara Schroeder regarding possible settlement. She indicated that they will be filing a motion to vacate oral argument while they work out details of settlement.EventPhone CallFinal
11/14/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacate (joint motion).MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/14/2008Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received joint motion to continue oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2008System - Status check - other - Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of settlement. Ms. Schroeder indicated that they have settled and are waiting for documents back from opposing counsel so that they may file dismissal.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
12/31/2008System - Status check - other Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of settlement. Ms. Schroeder indicated that they have settled and are still waiting for documents back from opposing counsel so that they may file dismissal.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/02/2009Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
01/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - stipulated motion to dismiss appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/7/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal