judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ADDISON GOOLSBEE v. TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY

Case: A-2641
A-2641
04/11/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ADDISON GOOLSBEE
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/01/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/09/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/22/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1950Response to Motion filed
12/07/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/22/1950Opinion issued
09/06/1950Submission reset
06/21/1950Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/01/1950Motion for RehearingFiling granted
05/09/1950Reply to Response
04/22/1950Response to Petition
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyRespondent
Addison GoolsbeePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information