judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8647
B-8647
07/18/1979
Application for Writ of Error
OCTAVIA NOVAK
RHONDA RAY STEVENS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/31/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1980Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/18/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/19/1980Opinion issued
02/11/1980Supplemental Brief filed
11/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
11/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
07/18/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/18/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rhonda Ray StevensRespondent
Octavia NovakPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information