judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8662
B-8662
07/17/1979
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN BENEFIT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
HILL COUNTRY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ANTHONY G. HARRIS, ANCILLARY RECEIVER OF OLD NTIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ALABAMA CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/07/1979Appendix FiledRespondent
08/07/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/07/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/01/1980Order from Lower Court filed
02/01/1980Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/21/1979Miscellaneous Motion
08/07/1979Appendix Filed
08/07/1979Response to Petition
08/07/1979Response to Petition
07/23/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/23/1979Document received (See Remarks)
07/17/1979Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Benefit Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Hill Country Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Anthony G. Harris, Ancillary Receiver of Old Ntional Insurance Company, an Alabama CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information