judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8643
B-8643
07/17/1979
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
TOM BOUNDS AND MERCEDES CO-OPERATIVE GIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/15/1980Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/01/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/22/1980Response to Motion filed
09/15/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/15/1980Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
08/15/1980Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/30/1980Dissenting opinion issued.
07/30/1980Opinion issued
04/15/1980Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/06/1980Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1980Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1980Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1980Document received (See Remarks)
11/08/1979Response to Motion filed
11/01/1979Motion for RehearingFiling granted
08/01/1979Response to Petition
07/17/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Phillip Robinson and Mert StarnesAmicus Curiae
State of TexasPetitioner
Tom Bounds and Mercedes Co-Operative GinRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information