judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8664
B-8664
07/23/1979
Application for Writ of Error
DON M. SMART
TOWER LAND AND INVESTMENT COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/26/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/22/1980Letter brief Respondent
12/19/1979Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/07/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1979Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
07/23/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/09/1981Motion to Withdraw Filed
06/26/1980Letter Filed
03/31/1980Response to Motion filed
03/27/1980Motion to Argue filed
03/26/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/12/1980Opinion issued
01/22/1980Letter brief
12/19/1979Brief on the Merits
10/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/07/1979Response to Petition
07/31/1979Supplement to Petition filed
07/23/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tower Land and Investment CompanyRespondent
Don M. SmartPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information