judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8677
B-8677
07/24/1979
Application for Writ of Error
SKYTOP RIG COMPANY
CARR WELL SERVICES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/22/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/10/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/29/1979Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/27/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/24/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1979Reply to Response
10/15/1979Response to Motion filed
10/10/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/29/1979Response to Petition
08/29/1979Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
07/27/1979Response to Petition
07/27/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/24/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Skytop Rig CompanyPetitioner
Carr Well Services, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information