judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8671
B-8671
07/24/1979
Application for Writ of Error
SOLOMON E. SIEBENLIST
DANNY RAY HARVILLE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/06/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/24/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1980Response to Motion filed
03/06/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/20/1980Opinion issued
08/06/1979Response to Petition
07/24/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/24/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Danny Ray HarvilleRespondent
Solomon E. SiebenlistPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information