Case Information: 60111 | |||
Short Caption: | JURADO (GABRIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44454 , 50154 , 60428 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR034742 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/25/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-02688 | |
02/24/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk The State of Nevada, Plaintiff vs. Gabriel Jurado, Defendant | 12-05921 | |
02/27/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 12-06077 | |
03/23/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-09305 | |
03/23/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
03/28/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 26, 2012. | 12-09305 |