Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
01/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 12-03126 |
01/30/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 12-03130 |
02/01/2012 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 12-03438 |
02/01/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart check no. 66004275. | | |
02/16/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 13, 2012. | | 12-05154 |
02/21/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant-Claytor) | | |
02/21/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Claytor). | | 12-05420 |
02/21/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) | | 12-05437 |
02/21/2012 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall. (Cross-Appeal). (Docketing Statement sent to counsel for Cross-Appeal). | | |
02/21/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). | | 12-05532 |
02/21/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Continuation of Exhibits to Docketing Statement (Exhibit D). | | 12-05536 |
02/21/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Continuation of Exhibits to Docketing Statement (Exhibit E). | | 12-05537 |
02/21/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Continuation of Exhibits to Docketing Statement (Exhibits F thru M). | | 12-05535 |
03/05/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement. | | 12-06923 |
04/03/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Joel Henriod of Lewis and Roca appearing on behalf of appellant Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.). | | 12-10456 |
04/26/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 12-13290 |
05/01/2012 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 15 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Fn3 [Upon completion of briefing, this appeal may be consolidated for purposes of disposition with the related appeal in Docket No. 60667.] | | 12-13717 |
05/16/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 12-15645 |
07/31/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 12-24040 |
07/31/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 29, 2012. | | 12-24060 |
08/29/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). | | 12-27445 |
09/06/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Appeal Nos. 60131 and 60667. | | 12-28257 |
09/10/2012 | Motion | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Non-Opposition to Motion To Consolidate Appeals 60131 and 60667. | | 12-28571 |
09/24/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Consolidate Appeals and for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 28, 2012. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 12-30071 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30575 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30576 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30577 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30578 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30579 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30580 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30581 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 8. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30582 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 9. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30583 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 10. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30584 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 11. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30593 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 12. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30595 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 13. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30596 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 14. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30597 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 15. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30598 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 16. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30599 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 17. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30600 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 18. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30601 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 19. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30602 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 20. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30603 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 21. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30604 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 22. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30605 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 23. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30606 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 24. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30608 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 25. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30609 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 26. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30610 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 27. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30612 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 28. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30613 |
09/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 29. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-30614 |
09/28/2012 | Motion | Filed Kinder Morgan's Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation. | | 12-30759 |
10/08/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Word Limit. Having considered the motion, we grant it and direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief provisionally received on September 28, 2012. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 12-31597 |
10/08/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 12-31601 |
11/01/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension Of Time To File Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos 60131/60667. | | 12-34592 |
11/01/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 07, 2012. | | 12-34599 |
12/05/2012 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion For An Extension Of Time To File Combined Answering Brief And Opening Brief On Cross-Appeal (Second Request). Nos 60131/60667. | | 12-38275 |
12/11/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents/cross-appellants' combined brief due: January 7, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 12-39000 |
01/04/2013 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion For An Extension of Time to File Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (Third Request). Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-00307 |
01/10/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Volume 12 of Appellant's Appendix. | | 13-01137 |
01/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion For Permission to File Combination Answering/Opening Brief In Excess of Word Count Limitation; Certification Of Counsel. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-01289 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 1. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01290 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 2. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01291 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 3. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01293 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 4. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01294 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 5. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01295 |
01/11/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief Vol. 6. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-01296 |
01/14/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion of Nevada Justice Association for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae (Attached is the Amicus Brief). Nos. 60131/60667. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER OF 2/19/13). | | 13-01496 |
02/19/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time, for Leave to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation, and for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court shall file respondents/cross-appellants' combined brief, which was provisionally received in this court on January 11, 2013. Additionally, the Nevada Justice Association has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of respondents/cross-appellants. Having considered the unopposed motion, we grant it and direct the clerk of this court to detach from the motion and file the amicus brief provisionally received in this court on January 14, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-05160 |
02/19/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief On Cross-Appeal. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-05170 |
02/19/2013 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-05171 |
02/26/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service - Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-05903 |
03/21/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Due 4/22/13. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-08463 |
03/21/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-appeal due April 22, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-08465 |
04/22/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-11821 |
05/14/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant/cross-respondent's: Reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: May 22, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-14139 |
05/22/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-15110 |
05/22/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-15111 |
05/22/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-15112 |
05/22/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-15113 |
05/23/2013 | Motion | Filed Kinder Morgan's Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation on Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-15223 |
06/24/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit. We direct the clerk of this court to file the combined brief provisionally received in this court on May 23, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-18471 |
06/24/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-18474 |
07/03/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension Of Time To File Reply Brief On Cross-Appeal. | | 13-19605 |
07/03/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend the time to file respondents/cross-appellant's reply brief is approved. Due date: July 22, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-19607 |
07/17/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief On Cross-Appeal. | | 13-20954 |
07/17/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
10/28/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-32226 |
11/12/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 8, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City, for 30 minutes. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-33713 |
12/05/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Expanding Time for Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 8, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. The parties were previously informed that oral argument would be limited to 30 minutes, notice is hereby given that the argument shall be 60 minutes. The start time remains the same. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-36647 |
12/17/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 13-38250 |
12/27/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Supplement Appendix. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-39489 |
12/27/2013 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 13-39490 |
12/31/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Expedited Response. Respondents shall have until 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, January 2, 2014, to file and serve any response to appellant's motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix. Appellant shall have until 4:00 p.m. on Friday, January 3, 2014, to file and serve any reply. The documents submitted pursuant to this order shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. We defer ruling on appellant's motion pending receipt and consideration of the response any any reply. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 13-39619 |
01/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellant's Motion to Supplement Appendix. Nos. 60131/60667. | | 14-00038 |
01/02/2014 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities (Respondents/Cross-Appellants). Nos. 60131/60667. | | 14-00039 |
01/08/2014 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. No. 60131/60667. | | |
01/10/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix, Volume 5, which was provisionally received in this court on December 27, 2013. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 14-01025 |
01/10/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 5. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 14-01026 |
12/16/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC Nos. 60131/60667. | | 14-40970 |
01/12/2015 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 60131/60667 | | 15-01145 |
01/12/2015 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 60131/60667 | | |
01/23/2015 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 15, 2015. | | 15-01145 |