judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARKET VS. HART

Case Information: 60112
Short Caption:BARKET VS. HARTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A590958Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Pickering for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/02/2012 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/08/2013How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
01/25/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 12-02711
01/25/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. 12-02714
01/25/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. 12-02718
01/30/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from CJD Law Group. Check no. 5083.
01/31/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant. 12-03288
02/01/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. 12-03462
02/02/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 12-03666
02/14/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 12-04925
02/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice. Case appeal statement due 10 days. 12-06187
03/05/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 9, 2012. 12-07009
04/12/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 12-11764
06/06/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or case appeal statement due: 10 days. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. 12-17795
06/12/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 12-18444
06/20/2012Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 12-19409
09/04/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. 12-27753
09/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: November 30, 2012. 12-29591
12/03/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. 12-37941
12/03/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. 12-37942
12/03/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 2 - 1 12-38040
12/03/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 3 - 1 12-38042
01/03/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Due February 1, 2013. 13-00128
01/03/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved Answering Brief due February 1, 2013. 13-00130
02/01/2013BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. 13-03441
02/28/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Answering Brief. 13-06307
02/28/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 03, 2013. 13-06327
04/03/2013BriefFiled Reply To Answering Brief. 13-09717
04/03/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/06/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing of Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. 13-13182
05/06/2013MotionFiled Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. 13-13186
05/08/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Arguement. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 13-13531
05/08/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/22/2013MotionFiled Motion For Extension Of Time To File Response To Respondent's Motion To Strike Portions Of Appellant's Reply Brief. 13-15185
06/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until June 21, 2013, to file and serve any opposition to the motion to strike. 13-17371
06/21/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief. 13-18380
06/26/2013MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike Portions of Reply Brief. 13-18810
12/13/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn1[We deny respondents' motion to strike portions of appellant's reply brief, and we note that we did not consider arguments raised for the first time on appeal.] NNP13-KP/JH/MC 13-37875
01/09/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 14-00836
01/09/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
01/24/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 14, 2014. 14-00836