judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3748
B-3748
01/03/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HILLTOP VILLAGE, INC.
KERRVILLE I.S.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/25/1973Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/03/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/23/1973Motion for Leave to file Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/16/1973Letter Filed
03/30/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/25/1973Brief on the Merits
01/03/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/03/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kerrville I.S.D.Respondent
Hilltop Village, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information