judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. SACHETTI

Case Information: 33420
Short Caption:EICON VS. SACHETTICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A387185Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00238
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/25/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Appellant's Docketing Statement. 99-00489
01/27/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed January 25, 1999, is granted. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on December 31, 1998, shall be filed forthwith. 99-00573
01/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00577
03/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are negotiating a settlement of this matter. 99-01615
03/18/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01970
03/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-02336
04/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-02422
04/01/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-02423
04/01/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-02424
04/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. 99-02715
04/09/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.