judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MELODIE A. STEELE v. ROBERT B. NEEMAN

Case Heading (S-08-0117)
Case Number:S-08-0117Case Docketed On:06/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:MELODIE A. STEELE v. ROBERT B. NEEMAN
Full Title:MELODIE A. STEELE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT B. NEEMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMelodie A. SteeleChristopher Michael Wages
AppelleeRobert A. NeemanChristopher Randal Ringer
DaNece Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support
Opinion Number:2009 WY 58
Citation:206 P.3d 384

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/17/2008Brief - Appellant; and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
07/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2008Event - Phone Call - received phone call from Christopher Ringer indicating that he is counsel for appellee, and was trying to file brief of appellee. It was docketed with appellee pro se. Added Mr. Ringer as counsel.EventPhone CallFinal
08/29/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of Appellee and Appellee's statement of costs and received copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/18/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/25/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/28/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/14/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/14/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/18/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/15/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal