judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAY (DUANE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 61987
Short Caption:GRAY (DUANE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 72614 , 72614-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR 11-6038Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/24/2014How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/29/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/29/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) 12-34052
10/29/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. 12-34054
11/01/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 07/10/12, 07/11/12, 07/12/12, 07/13/12 Court Reporter: Zoie Williams Filed in district court on: 10/23/12. 12-34565
12/05/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to Remove from Fast Track Program and Direct Full Briefing. 12-38329
12/06/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. 12-38508
03/04/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening brief and appendix due: March 13, 2013. 13-06593
03/04/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. 13-06677
03/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. 13-07377
03/12/2013BriefFiled Gray's Opening Brief on Appeal. 13-07464
03/12/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 1 through 4. 13-07465
04/05/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix. 13-10028
04/10/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: July 10, 2013. 13-10581
07/10/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. 13-20122
07/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Submitted Brief. We therefore direct the clerk of this court to reject the answering brief received via E-Flex. Respondent shall have until August 9, 2013, to file and serve an answer brief that complies with NRAP 32. 13-21235
08/07/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 13-23201
09/09/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until September 13, 2013, to file and serve the reply brief. 13-26455
09/11/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time in Which to File Appellant's Reply to Answering Brief. 13-26874
09/11/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 4, 2013. 13-26883
10/04/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. 13-29694
10/04/2013Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. 13-29698
10/04/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. 14-20739
09/29/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Saitta, J., dissenting. NNP14-KP/RP/NS 14-32210
10/15/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. 14-34338
11/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. 14-38296
12/11/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Response to Appellant's Petition forRehearing. 14-40316
12/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 20, 2014, this court ordered respondent to file and serve an answer to appellant's petition for rehearing. A review of this court's records reveals that respondent was not electronically served with the November 20, 2014, order. Therefore, respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer to the peition. fn1[In light of this order, respondent's motion to extend time to file its answer is denied as moot.] 14-40546
12/15/2014Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 14-40683
12/30/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Saitta, J., dissenting. 14-42392
01/26/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 15-02784
01/26/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 28, 2015. 15-02784