Case Information: 62000 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMOS (FRANSISCO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61755 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C270356 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/05/2012 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
10/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-34263 | |
11/09/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 12-35483 | |
12/05/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 12-38322 | |
12/05/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/10/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). | ||
05/15/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance in Docket No. 61755 and Order Administratively Closing Appeal in Docket No. 62000. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED in Docket No. 61755 and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THE APPEAL in Docket No. 62000." SNP13-MG/MD/NS Nos. 61755/62000 | 13-14409 | |
05/15/2013 | Case Status Update | Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. |