judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MALIK EVANS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1281
Short Caption:MALIK EVANS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14642-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMalik Evans Y
Vicki C. BryantYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Angela Pegram Saffoe NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Vickie Bryant, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/01/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Vickie Bryant, Esquire
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (59pgs/Tape) 9/29/10 proc. w/CD
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 8/10/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7pgs/Tape) 8/30/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8pgs/Tape) 10/1/10 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/09/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 1, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/07/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript (needs motion for leave in accordance with this Court's 12/9/2010 order - attorney notified by phone. Per phone call w/attorney the MOLV w/b filed this evening in the After Hours Box)
01/10/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
02/02/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript isf iled. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
02/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 21, 2011 (unopposed)
03/21/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief w/Appendix attached
03/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no oppostion has been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
03/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
04/25/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/attachment
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/26/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to supplement the record
07/27/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 - BARRING ORDER
07/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
07/27/2011FiledAffirmed
08/18/2011FiledMandate