judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3716
B-3716
12/15/1972
Application for Writ of Error
CHESTER L. TYRA, ET AL.
H. V. WOODSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/18/1973Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/05/1973Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/02/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1973Opinion issued
04/18/1973Response to Brief filed
04/05/1973Supplemental Brief filed
02/28/1973Document received (See Remarks)
02/28/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/02/1973Response to Petition
12/15/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/15/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. V. Woodson, et al.Respondent
Chester L. Tyra, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information