Case Information: 61995 | |||
Short Caption: | SIOW (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 69009 , 69009-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C273600 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/12/2013 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
10/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 12-34194 | |
11/14/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 12-36169 | |
11/15/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/6/11; 9/28/11; 10/12/11; 1/23/12; 6/12/12; 7/2/12; 7/11/12; 7/23/12; 7/24/12; 7/25/12; 7/26/12; 7/27/12; 7/30/12; and 10/2/12. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt; Maria Garibay; and Kerry Esparza. | 12-36183 | |
12/06/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts (Court Reporter Kerry Esparza). | 12-38516 | |
12/14/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion in Part and Regarding Briefing Schedule. Court recorder Esparza: Certificate of Delivery due: February 25, 2013. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 15, 2013. | 12-39582 | |
12/27/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/28/11; 10/12/11; 1/23/12; 6/12/12; 7/2/12; and 7/11/12. | 12-41006 | |
12/31/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/06/11. | 12-41325 | |
02/04/2013 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/23/12; 7/24/12; 7/25/12; 7/26/12; 7/27/12; 7/30/12; and 10/2/12. | 13-03520 | |
05/14/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File OB. | 13-14192 | |
05/15/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stioulation. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendx due: June 14, 2013. | 13-14337 | |
06/13/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Opening Brief and Appendix) | 13-17524 | |
06/17/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 29, 2013. | 13-17807 | |
07/30/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 13-22327 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I. | 13-22328 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II. | 13-22330 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III. | 13-22331 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV. | 13-22332 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V. | 13-22333 | |
07/30/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI. | 13-22334 | |
08/27/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 13-25361 | |
09/25/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. | 13-28637 | |
09/25/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 25, 2013. | 13-28730 | |
10/28/2013 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 13-32295 | |
10/28/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
11/12/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. | 13-33835 | |
11/12/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/21/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP14-JH/MD/MC. | 14-01914 | |
02/18/2014 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 14-05181 | |
02/18/2014 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/26/2014 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 20, 2014. | 14-05181 | |
10/17/2014 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document received in this office 10/16/14. | 14-36578 |